U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-05010
  • Case Name: Daniels v. Kissack
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 01, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 14, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • February 08, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Stipulation]
January, 2017
  • January 29, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 27, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Set Deadlines/Hearing]
  • January 27, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 27, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 27, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Refund Fee (Text Order)]
  • January 27, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Refund Fee (No Notice)]
  • January 19, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 06, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 04, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • January 04, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • December 21, 2016: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 20, 2016: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • December 07, 2016: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Additional Summons Issued]
  • December 07, 2016: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.