U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-04165
  • Case Name: Davis v. South Dakota Public Assurance Alliance et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 17, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 07, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 07, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • October 06, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 06, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • October 06, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 18, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • August 17, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 17, 2017: [Protective Order]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 27, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • January 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 19, 2017: [Discovery Report]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • December 23, 2016: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • December 22, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 22, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 09, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • December 07, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • December 07, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 07, 2016: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 07, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.