U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-01020
  • Case Name: Harty v. State of Wisconsin Acting by and Through the Wisco
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • February 09, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 07, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • February 07, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Support Document]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • January 12, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 10, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 10, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • December 07, 2016: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • December 07, 2016: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.