U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-50305
  • Case Name: Pat Alan Hight and Amy Louise Hight
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
  • July 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service of TFR (Used only by Ch 7 Trustee)]
  • July 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation (Without Notice)]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
February, 2017
  • February 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • February 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • February 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • January 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • December 07, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • December 07, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 07, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 07, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • December 07, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • December 07, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 07, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 07, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.