U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cr-50144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 01, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 22, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 28, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 28, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 28, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 28, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 28, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 14, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 15, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 13, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 09, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 09, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • December 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.