U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-04166
  • Case Name: Marlette v. Menard, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 20, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal (Attorney)]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • February 07, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Pretrial Submissions]
  • January 31, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 31, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 31, 2019: [Jury List]
  • January 31, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 31, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 31, 2019: [In Limine]
  • January 31, 2019: [Witness List]
  • January 31, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Review Costs Taxed]
  • January 25, 2019: [Review Costs Taxed]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 22, 2018: [Jury List]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2018: [Status Conference]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 12, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 16, 2017: [Protective Order]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 02, 2017: [Discovery Report]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • January 10, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 27, 2016: [Return of Service Executed]
  • December 07, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • December 07, 2016: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 07, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • December 07, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.