U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-10167
  • Case Name: Matthew Gene Mohr and Heather Marie Mohr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (text order)]
  • April 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • February 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismissing Case (text order) Ch 12/13]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Affidavit of Default]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
May, 2018
  • May 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Vacate Order]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Vacate Order (No Notice Required)]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Affidavit of Default]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Set Hearing]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (with waiver) (fee required)]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Set Hearing]
  • September 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation]
  • March 18, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Denial of Discharge]
  • March 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • March 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Plan]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objecting to Discharge]
  • February 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • February 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objecting to Discharge (Rule 4004)]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • January 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Set Deadlines]
  • January 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • January 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Late Notice]
  • January 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • January 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Conclusion]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Plan]
  • December 20, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 20, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • December 20, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 20, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Debtor(s) Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • December 20, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedule J]
  • December 20, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedule I]
  • December 20, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedule H]
  • December 20, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedule G]
  • December 20, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedule E/F]
  • December 20, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedule D]
  • December 20, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedule C]
  • December 20, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedule A/B]
  • December 20, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 14, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 12, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • December 12, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice Appointing Successor Trustee]
  • December 10, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 09, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Appointment Rejection]
  • December 09, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.