U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Makes Good
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Consent]
  • March 19, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 19, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 18, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 16, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 04, 2021: [Furlough]
  • March 01, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 19, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 19, 2021: [Consent]
  • February 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 19, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 14, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 11, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 04, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 24, 2020: [Consent]
  • November 24, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 24, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 24, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 24, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 10, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 10, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 06, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 06, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 06, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 06, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 05, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 20, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 26, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 21, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 21, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 21, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 01, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • October 23, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 06, 2018: [Request]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 05, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 05, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 05, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 05, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 08, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 08, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 20, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 17, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 17, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 17, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 16, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 24, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 24, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 17, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 17, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 13, 2017: [Response]
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 11, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 11, 2017: [Release from Custody]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • September 11, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 01, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Consent]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 12, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • July 11, 2017: [Furlough]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 02, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 02, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 02, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 02, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • June 02, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 02, 2017: [Waiver]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 22, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • May 22, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 22, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 22, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • May 04, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 04, 2017: [Release from Custody]
  • May 02, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 14, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 12, 2017: [Furlough]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • March 22, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 22, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 20, 2017: [Arrest]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 15, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 09, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 09, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 09, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice]
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 09, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 08, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.