U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-50306
  • Case Name: Neal Morris Rogers and Teann Terese Rogers
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 12 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
  • September 08, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Application 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • August 20, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • August 12, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 10, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 16, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • July 14, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • July 13, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • July 13, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor(s) Final Report and Account (Ch 12)]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Service of Final Form]
  • May 19, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline(s)]
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
  • March 10, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • February 18, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • February 14, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • February 14, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • February 12, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
November, 2018
  • November 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Affidavit of Default]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
October, 2017
  • October 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Corrective Entry]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Order Request]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • September 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Claim]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • August 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Hearing (For Confirmations, Obj to Claims and Withdraw as Atty (LBR 2091-1(b)) ONLY)]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • July 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • July 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • July 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Status Conference]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • June 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • June 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transcript (Depositions and 2004 Exams Only)]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Evidentiary Hearing]
  • May 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Examination 2004]
  • April 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Examination (2004)]
  • April 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Time]
  • March 16, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • March 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • March 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Time]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • February 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • February 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • February 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • February 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • February 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • January 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • January 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment to Petition with Notice]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor(s) Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • January 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • December 29, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • December 21, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • December 20, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • December 13, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 12, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • December 12, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • December 11, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 09, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • December 09, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Corrective Entry]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 [Corrective Entry]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 [Add Trustee]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.