U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-40514
  • Case Name: Jeffery Allen Davis and Patricia Ann Davis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • February 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • February 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Deadlines]
  • February 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement (not to be used by attorney not admitted to this federal bar)]
  • February 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • February 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Deadlines]
  • February 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement (not to be used by attorney not admitted to this federal bar)]
  • February 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion]
  • January 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Withdrawal of Report of No Distribution]
  • January 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • January 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • January 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • January 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • December 28, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • December 14, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 12, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • December 12, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismissing Corporate Joint Debtor]
  • December 09, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • December 09, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 09, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • December 09, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 09, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 09, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 09, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 09, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 09, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 09, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
  • December 09, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.