U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-30039
  • Case Name: Richard Fred Hall
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 12 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reminder for Filing Application for Fees]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Order Request]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
March, 2017
  • March 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • March 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • March 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • January 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • January 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 14, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 12, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • December 12, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • December 12, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • December 12, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • December 12, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 12, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 12, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 12, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.