U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:96-cr-30109-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Bruguier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 26, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 12, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 12, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 18, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • July 18, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 17, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 19, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 14, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 13, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 13, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 17, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 06, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 04, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 31, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • August 29, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 27, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 08, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 08, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 08, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 08, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 07, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 07, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 31, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 31, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 18, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 18, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 16, 2017: [Transcript]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 10, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 04, 2017: [For Order]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 17, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 17, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • February 16, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 16, 2017: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • February 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 19, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • January 19, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 19, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 19, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 06, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 30, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 29, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 21, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 14, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.