U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clark
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 07, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 29, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 25, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 22, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 22, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order of Detention]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • October 15, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 14, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 13, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 08, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 08, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 08, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 07, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 10, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 20, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 17, 2020: [Consent]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 27, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 19, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 18, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 10, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 09, 2020: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • March 09, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 09, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 03, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 02, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 02, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 02, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 08, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 05, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 03, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 03, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 26, 2017: [Continue]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 06, 2017: [Continue]
  • December 04, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 04, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 14, 2017: [Continue]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • August 29, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Response]
  • December 16, 2016: [Request]
  • December 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 13, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 13, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 13, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 13, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 13, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 13, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.