U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cook
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 12, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 17, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 27, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 27, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 27, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • June 27, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 27, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 27, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 11, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 04, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 20, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 19, 2018: [Letter]
  • September 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 28, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 28, 2018: [Order]
  • August 28, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 28, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 28, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 17, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 13, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Order]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • July 17, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 17, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 12, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 12, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 11, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 11, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 11, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 11, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 18, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 18, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 13, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 07, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • February 06, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 06, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 06, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order]
  • February 03, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 19, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • December 19, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 16, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order]
  • December 15, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 14, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • December 14, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 14, 2016: [Request]
  • December 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 14, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 14, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 14, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 14, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 13, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 13, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 13, 2016: [Request]
  • December 13, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 13, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 13, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 13, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.