U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-50311
  • Case Name: Justin Joesph Thompson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Petition with Notice]
  • January 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 28, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • December 27, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • December 27, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Mailing List with Notice - Adding Creditors (fee required) (Court)]
  • December 27, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • December 27, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 27, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 27, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedules A-J]
  • December 27, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Debtor(s) Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • December 27, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 16, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 14, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • December 14, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • December 14, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee(s) (Individual)]
  • December 14, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 14, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • December 14, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 14, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.