U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30177-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bear Shield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 19, 2025: [Furlough]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 11, 2024: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 10, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 08, 2024: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 08, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 23, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 17, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 17, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 10, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 17, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 17, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 16, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial]
  • July 13, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 13, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 13, 2020: [Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 13, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 03, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 03, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 06, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 18, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 11, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 04, 2017: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • August 10, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 10, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 10, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • August 10, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • August 10, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • August 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 31, 2017: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 31, 2017: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 31, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 21, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 19, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 30, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • December 30, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order]
  • December 27, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 27, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 22, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 21, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 21, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 21, 2016: [Request]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 20, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.