U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30172-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DuBray
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 10, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 05, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • September 03, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 03, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 19, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 22, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 22, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • July 22, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 22, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 22, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 02, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 02, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 12, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 08, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 21, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 21, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 16, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 12, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 12, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 23, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 16, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 16, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 16, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 09, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 02, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 24, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 24, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 24, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 24, 2017: [Extend]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 10, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 09, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 09, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 09, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 09, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 09, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 06, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 06, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • January 06, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • January 06, 2017: [Request]
  • January 06, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 03, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.