U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30178-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Prue
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 19, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 18, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 17, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • October 17, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • October 04, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 30, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 30, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 04, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 25, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 21, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 21, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 04, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 25, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 25, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 25, 2019: [Furlough]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 03, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 03, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 26, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 20, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 13, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order for Summons - Probation Request]
  • December 12, 2018: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 12, 2018: [Request for Summons]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 30, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 27, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 21, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 16, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 24, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 23, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 04, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 04, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 30, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 30, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 06, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order]
  • January 03, 2017: [Stipulation]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 23, 2016: [Request]
  • December 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 22, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 21, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 21, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 21, 2016: [Request]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.