U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30179-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 18, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 15, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 19, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 15, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 15, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 15, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 15, 2017: [Extend]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Order]
  • December 27, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 21, 2016: [Request]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 20, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 20, 2016: [Request]
  • December 15, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.