U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30173-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Young et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 01, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • November 30, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 20, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 16, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 15, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 13, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2017: [Extend]
  • November 09, 2017: [Extend]
  • November 03, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 16, 2017: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • October 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 16, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 16, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 16, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 16, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 16, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 16, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 12, 2017: [Witness List]
  • October 12, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 10, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 10, 2017: [In Limine]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • October 06, 2017: [Jury List]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 17, 2017: [Consent]
  • August 16, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 09, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 22, 2017: [Furlough]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2017: [Consent]
  • May 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2017: [Consent]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Consent]
  • February 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • January 03, 2017: [Request]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order]
  • December 29, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 27, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 27, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 27, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 27, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 27, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 27, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 27, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 27, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 27, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 27, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 27, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 27, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 27, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 27, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 23, 2016: [Request]
  • December 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 22, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 21, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 21, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment]
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.