U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30169-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mound
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 08, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 10, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 22, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 22, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 22, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • August 22, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 23, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 22, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 19, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 19, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 19, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • July 18, 2019: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 18, 2019: [Request for Warrant]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 22, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 09, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 09, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 09, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 02, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 02, 2018: [Extend]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • November 03, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • November 03, 2017: [Verdict]
  • November 03, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 02, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • November 02, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 01, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 01, 2017: [Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Jury List]
  • October 31, 2017: [Voir Dire Began]
  • October 31, 2017: [In Limine]
  • October 31, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 30, 2017: [Witness List]
  • October 30, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 27, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 27, 2017: [Witness List]
  • October 23, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice]
  • October 18, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 18, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 18, 2017: [In Limine]
  • October 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • October 04, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 19, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order]
  • June 28, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 28, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 28, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 28, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 28, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 27, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 27, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 27, 2017: [Request]
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 26, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 26, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 13, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Detainer Lodged]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.