U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stoneman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 14, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 14, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 23, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • September 23, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 23, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 08, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 26, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • July 05, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • July 05, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 08, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • June 06, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 29, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 28, 2017: [Forfeiture]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Declaration of Publication]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 28, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 28, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 16, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 16, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 16, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 15, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 01, 2017: [Continue]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 30, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 19, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • January 09, 2017: [Request]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 05, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 05, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 04, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 04, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 03, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 30, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 30, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 30, 2016: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 29, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 29, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 28, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 28, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 23, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 23, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 15, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 14, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment]
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.