U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30168-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mexican et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Status Conference]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 14, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • October 08, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 08, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 08, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 03, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • October 03, 2019: [Release from Custody]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Subpoena Issued]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Subpoena(s)]
  • September 16, 2019: [Subpoena(s)]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 23, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 10, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 09, 2019: [Psychiatric Report Received]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • March 15, 2019: [Competency Report]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Medical Exam]
  • February 06, 2019: [Medical Exam]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Competency Report]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Competency Report]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Order]
  • August 08, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [Status Conference]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Psychiatric Report Received]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 16, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • July 06, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • July 03, 2018: [Psychiatric Report Received]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 21, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • February 09, 2018: [Letter]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 29, 2018: [Competency Report]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 16, 2018: [Continue]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Medical Exam]
  • November 13, 2017: [Medical Exam]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 20, 2017: [Furlough]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 19, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 17, 2017: [Competency Hearing]
  • October 17, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 17, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • October 12, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Competency Report]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 18, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • August 17, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • August 16, 2017: [Furlough]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 01, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • July 13, 2017: [Psychiatric Exam]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Order]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • May 08, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 02, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 20, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 19, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 19, 2017: [Consent]
  • April 19, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 09, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 09, 2017: [Consent]
  • February 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 07, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • February 07, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 06, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Order]
  • January 19, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 19, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • January 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • January 09, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Order]
  • December 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 23, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 21, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 21, 2016: [Request]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order]
  • December 20, 2016: [Request]
  • December 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 19, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 16, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 16, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 16, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 16, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 16, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 16, 2016: [Request]
  • December 15, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.