U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30170-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marshall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • July 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 24, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • July 21, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • July 07, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 27, 2016: [Order]
  • December 21, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 21, 2016: [Request]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 20, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 20, 2016: [Request]
  • December 15, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.