U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30182-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oakie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 06, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 08, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 08, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 08, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 30, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • July 16, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 16, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • July 16, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 16, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 14, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 07, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 01, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 22, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 17, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 08, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 13, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 13, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • January 13, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 13, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 13, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 13, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 11, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 30, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 26, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 24, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 24, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 10, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 29, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 29, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 29, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 29, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 29, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 20, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 05, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 05, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 05, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 24, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 24, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 24, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 05, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 05, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 05, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Order]
  • April 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 25, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 25, 2017: [Furlough]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 24, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Order]
  • March 06, 2017: [Response]
  • March 06, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 03, 2017: [Request]
  • March 03, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 02, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 02, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 02, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 02, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 02, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 02, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 02, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 02, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 02, 2017: [Request]
  • March 01, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 01, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.