U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30181-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nault-Hart
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Judgment of Acquittal]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 21, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • September 21, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 03, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 02, 2017: [Sentencing]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 22, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 07, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Supplement]
  • August 29, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 28, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2017: [Furlough]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 17, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 12, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 12, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 12, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 29, 2017: [Extend]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Order]
  • May 19, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 18, 2017: [Request]
  • May 16, 2017: [Request]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • May 16, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 16, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 15, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 15, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 15, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 15, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 15, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 15, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 15, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 15, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 15, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 15, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 15, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 06, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.