U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30180-1
  • Case Name: USA v. St. Cloud
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 08, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 07, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 07, 2018: [Sentencing]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 28, 2018: [Extend]
  • February 27, 2018: [Extend]
  • February 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 20, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 20, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 20, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • February 07, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 06, 2018: [Extend]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 19, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 06, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 06, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 06, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 05, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • December 05, 2017: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 05, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 05, 2017: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 05, 2017: [Extend]
  • December 05, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 05, 2017: [Notice]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 05, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 04, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 04, 2017: [Extend]
  • December 04, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 01, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • December 01, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 01, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 28, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 21, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 03, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order]
  • February 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 06, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 03, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 03, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 02, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 02, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 02, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 02, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 02, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 02, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 02, 2017: [Request]
  • February 02, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 02, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2017: [Bail Report]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 24, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 20, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • January 20, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.