U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30174-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brave Bird
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 02, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 02, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 23, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 20, 2018: [Furlough]
  • April 18, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 11, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 14, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 14, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 14, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 14, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 22, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 06, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 23, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 15, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 11, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 10, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 31, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 31, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 31, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order]
  • July 25, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 20, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 20, 2017: [Request]
  • July 19, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 18, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 18, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 17, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 10, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Request]
  • April 17, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 17, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • April 16, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.