U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30176-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spaid
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • April 30, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 30, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 30, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 19, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 19, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 19, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 22, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 08, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • February 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 06, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 06, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 05, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 05, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 30, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 27, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 22, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 20, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 20, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 20, 2017: [Transcript]
  • September 11, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 11, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 05, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 01, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 01, 2017: [Witness List]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Reply]
  • August 21, 2017: [Response]
  • August 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 11, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 11, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 11, 2017: [Suppress]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 17, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 19, 2017: [Discovery]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 08, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 05, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 10, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Order]
  • December 27, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 27, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 23, 2016: [Request]
  • December 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 22, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • December 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 22, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 21, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 20, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 14, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.