U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-40525
  • Case Name: Tyler James McGregor and Rebecca Ann McGregor
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • April 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Exhibits Destroyed]
  • April 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
  • April 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • March 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • March 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • March 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Abandonment, Compel and Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • March 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document]
  • March 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Complaint]
  • March 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • March 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Complaint]
  • March 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Court's Exhibit and Witness List]
  • March 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Deadlines]
  • March 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • March 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Convert Chapter 12 to 7 (fee required)]
  • March 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • March 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (Text Entry)]
  • March 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • March 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Stipulation]
  • March 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
February, 2017
  • February 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • February 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • January 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • January 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • January 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional]
  • January 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • January 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 29, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 28, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (Text Entry)]
  • December 18, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 16, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 16, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • December 16, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • December 16, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • December 16, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 16, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 16, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 16, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 16, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 16, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 16, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
  • December 16, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.