U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-01021
  • Case Name: Plains Commerce Bank v. Moe et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • June 20, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • June 15, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • June 15, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 15, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena(s)]
  • May 01, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Set Deadlines/Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • January 03, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • January 03, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • December 19, 2016: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • December 16, 2016: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 16, 2016: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.