U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scott
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • April 27, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 03, 2018: [Forfeiture]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2017
  • August 08, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 08, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 07, 2017: [Sentencing]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 31, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 31, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 21, 2017: [Declaration of Publication]
  • July 13, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 31, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 22, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 22, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 16, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 16, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 16, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 12, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 07, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 27, 2017: [Hearing ]
  • March 27, 2017: [Revoke]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Discovery]
  • January 13, 2017: [Response]
  • January 13, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 12, 2017: [Discovery]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Request]
  • December 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 20, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 20, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 20, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 19, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.