U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zagra
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • January 30, 2018: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [For Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 13, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 13, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 12, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • September 13, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 13, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 30, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 30, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • June 09, 2017: [Consent]
  • June 09, 2017: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • June 09, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 09, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 09, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • December 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 21, 2016: [Request]
  • December 21, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 20, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 20, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 20, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 20, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 20, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.