U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30184-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Douville et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • July 12, 2021: [Receipt]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • January 21, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 27, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 04, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • January 04, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 26, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 18, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 13, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 16, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 11, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 11, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 11, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Request for Early Termination]
  • March 08, 2018: [Request for Early Termination]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 05, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 08, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • August 08, 2017: [Order for Return of Exhibit(s)]
  • August 08, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 01, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 31, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 31, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • July 31, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 31, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • July 31, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 20, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 20, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 20, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 14, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 07, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 27, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 23, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 23, 2017: [Order]
  • June 23, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2017: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • June 21, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 20, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 16, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 16, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 16, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 16, 2017: [Furlough]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 05, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2017: [Furlough]
  • June 02, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 02, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 01, 2017: [Furlough]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 18, 2017: [Furlough]
  • May 16, 2017: [Furlough]
  • May 08, 2017: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2017: [Subpoena Returned Unexecuted]
  • May 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 04, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 03, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 03, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 03, 2017: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • May 03, 2017: [Case No Longer Referred]
  • May 03, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 03, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 03, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 03, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 03, 2017: [Information - Felony]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 02, 2017: [In Limine]
  • May 02, 2017: [Witness List]
  • May 02, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 02, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 01, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 01, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 01, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Consent]
  • April 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Order of Detention]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 17, 2017: [Consent]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Consent]
  • January 24, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 11, 2017: [Request]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order]
  • January 07, 2017: [Request]
  • January 04, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • January 04, 2017: [Request]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 04, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 04, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 04, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order]
  • January 03, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 03, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 03, 2017: [Request]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 30, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 30, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 30, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 30, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 30, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 30, 2016: [Ex Parte Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 30, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 29, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 29, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 29, 2016: [Request]
  • December 28, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 28, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 21, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.