U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Felicianosoto
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 15, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 05, 2018: [Compel ]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • September 26, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 26, 2018: [Transcript]
  • September 25, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 25, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • September 25, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • September 25, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 25, 2018: [Transcript]
  • September 17, 2018: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • September 04, 2018: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • August 01, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • July 19, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 19, 2018: [Transcript]
  • July 12, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 12, 2018: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 10, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 10, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • July 10, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 10, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 09, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 09, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 02, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 02, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 25, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 15, 2018: [Transcript]
  • June 14, 2018: [Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 02, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 02, 2018: [Extend]
  • May 02, 2018: [Transcript]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 19, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 14, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • February 14, 2018: [Verdict]
  • February 14, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • February 14, 2018: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • February 14, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • February 14, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 14, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • February 14, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Executed]
  • February 13, 2018: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • February 13, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 13, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 12, 2018: [Jury List]
  • February 12, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • February 12, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 12, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • February 07, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • February 05, 2018: [In Limine]
  • February 05, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 29, 2018: [In Limine]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 11, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2017: [Discovery]
  • December 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 16, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • November 07, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 07, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 05, 2017: [Status Conference]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 19, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Consent]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 26, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 01, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Discovery]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 07, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 07, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 13, 2017: [Discovery]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 22, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 22, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2016: [Interpreter Needed]
  • December 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 20, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 20, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.