U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sutton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 30, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 23, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 21, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 19, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 10, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 10, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 02, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 25, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 25, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 25, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 23, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 23, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 16, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 18, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 18, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 18, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 18, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 12, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 07, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 12, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 23, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 23, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 23, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 23, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 23, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 22, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 23, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 18, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 11, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 11, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 04, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 12, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 12, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 12, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 12, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 04, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 04, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 04, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 20, 2017: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • December 13, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 08, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 07, 2017: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 05, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 05, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 07, 2017: [Request]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 01, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 01, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 01, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 01, 2017: [Arraignment]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 30, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2017: [Arrest]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.