U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50169-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coleman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • December 07, 2018: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 24, 2018: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
  • May 17, 2018: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • May 17, 2018: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 12, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order]
  • March 01, 2018: [Stipulation]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 16, 2018: [Extend]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 17, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 09, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 09, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 09, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 19, 2017: [Release from Custody]
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • September 28, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 21, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • August 18, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 18, 2017: [Consent]
  • August 18, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 10, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 10, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 10, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 21, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 18, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 18, 2017: [Furlough]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 14, 2017: [Consent]
  • July 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 14, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 14, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 13, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • July 12, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 10, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 07, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 07, 2017: [Sentencing]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 29, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 29, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 29, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 28, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 15, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 24, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 24, 2017: [Consent]
  • March 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 09, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 09, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 09, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 27, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 25, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 25, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 05, 2017: [Request]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 03, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 30, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 30, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 30, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 30, 2016: [Consent]
  • December 30, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 30, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 30, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 30, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 30, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 30, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 30, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 30, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.