U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50170-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yankton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Exhibits]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 18, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 20, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 20, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 22, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 22, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 21, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 15, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 09, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 09, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 15, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 25, 2018: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • June 25, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 25, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 13, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 13, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 11, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 24, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 21, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 21, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 11, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 11, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 05, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 14, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 14, 2017: [Consent]
  • April 14, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 23, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 23, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 23, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 10, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 25, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 06, 2017: [Request]
  • January 06, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 06, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 05, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • January 03, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 30, 2016: [Consent]
  • December 30, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 30, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 30, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 30, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 30, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 30, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 30, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 30, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.