U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50167-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mann
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 11, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 05, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Extend]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Extend]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 18, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 18, 2017: [Extend]
  • April 11, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 11, 2017: [Suppress]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 06, 2017: [Request]
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 06, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 06, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 06, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 06, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 01, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Indictment]
  • December 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.