U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50173-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hamm
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • December 15, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 04, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 22, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • May 07, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 07, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 07, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 02, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 23, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • January 23, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 19, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 19, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 19, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 19, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 18, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 18, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 18, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 18, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 17, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 12, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • January 10, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • January 10, 2018: [Reply]
  • January 09, 2018: [Response]
  • January 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2018: [Notice]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 02, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2017
  • December 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 28, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 28, 2017: [Jury List]
  • December 04, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 29, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 29, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 27, 2017: [Disclosure ]
  • November 27, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 11, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2017: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • October 10, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • October 04, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Summons]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 27, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 26, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 26, 2017: [Request]
  • January 20, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 20, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 20, 2017: [Arrest]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 20, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 20, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 20, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • January 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.