U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50166-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quiver
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 20, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 17, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 09, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 09, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 09, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 26, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 20, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 10, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 31, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 31, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 31, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 31, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 09, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 04, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 19, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 19, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 19, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 19, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 19, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 09, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 06, 2018: [Sentencing]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 29, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 29, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 29, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 09, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 09, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 09, 2018: [Waiver]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 26, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 26, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 26, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 19, 2017: [Request]
  • September 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 18, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 18, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 18, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 18, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 14, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 14, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Indictment]
  • December 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.