U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50172-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Iron
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 12, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 11, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 11, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 11, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 08, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 16, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 16, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 17, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 04, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 19, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 16, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 16, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 16, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 05, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 05, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 02, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 29, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 29, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 25, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 25, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 25, 2017: [Waiver]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Continue]
  • May 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 18, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 18, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 18, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • April 18, 2017: [Text Order]
  • April 18, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • April 18, 2017: [Redacted Indictment / Superseding Indictment for Service]
  • April 18, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • April 18, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 08, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 05, 2017: [Request]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 03, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 29, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 29, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 29, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 29, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 29, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 29, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 29, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 28, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 27, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 23, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.