U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50165-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chase In Winter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 29, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 25, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 22, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 22, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 22, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 21, 2018: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • June 21, 2018: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 21, 2018: [Request for Warrant]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 03, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 02, 2017: [Sentencing]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 25, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 25, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 08, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 23, 2017: [Consent]
  • June 23, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 25, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 25, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 25, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 10, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 10, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 10, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 08, 2017: [Arrest]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 09, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 10, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 10, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • January 05, 2017: [Reconsideration]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 27, 2016: [Request]
  • December 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 23, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 23, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.