U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cendejas-Aguilar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 13, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 13, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 02, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 04, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 04, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 29, 2016: [Discovery]
  • December 22, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 21, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2016: [Interpreter Needed]
  • December 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 20, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.