U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30167-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cavanaugh
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • May 24, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 18, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 15, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 15, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 15, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • May 04, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 04, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 04, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 01, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 16, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 17, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 17, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 17, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 17, 2017: [Extend]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 29, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • December 27, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 27, 2016: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 21, 2016: [Request]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 20, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 20, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 20, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 20, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.