U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cv-05117
  • Case Name: Supreme Pro Clean LLC v. Lowry et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 05, 2017: [Dismiss]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 17, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 21, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • December 21, 2016: [Declaration]
  • December 21, 2016: [Certificate]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
  • December 21, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.