U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cv-05116
  • Case Name: Jacobowski v. Robinson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 21, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 03, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 01, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 31, 2017: [Response]
  • October 31, 2017: [Discovery]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • September 28, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 01, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 01, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 07, 2017: [Form 52 Report]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • January 05, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 05, 2017: [Return of Service]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • December 21, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • December 21, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 21, 2016: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.