U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30166-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dupris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 07, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • April 07, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 03, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 04, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 04, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 04, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 04, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • December 04, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 03, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 03, 2019: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • November 26, 2019: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 26, 2019: [Request for Summons]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 26, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 16, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 16, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 10, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 30, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order]
  • August 30, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 30, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 23, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 18, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 16, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 16, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 24, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 12, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 11, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 05, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 07, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 03, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 03, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 03, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 02, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 01, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • February 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 01, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Consent]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 27, 2016: [Order]
  • December 27, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 23, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 21, 2016: [Request]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 21, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 21, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.