U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-10004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Iron Thunder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 02, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • October 02, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 01, 2018: [Affidavit]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 24, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 23, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 23, 2018: [Furlough]
  • August 22, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 21, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 21, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 14, 2018: [Objection]
  • August 09, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2018: [Consent]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Consent]
  • July 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 23, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 17, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 12, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 12, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 12, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 03, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • May 02, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 15, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 03, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 03, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order of Detention]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 18, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 17, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 17, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 13, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 07, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 07, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 07, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 24, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 27, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 23, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 23, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 23, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 23, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 23, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • December 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 23, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 23, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 22, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.