U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cv-05118
  • Case Name: Veal et al v. Hixon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 22, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal (Attorney)]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 14, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Stipulation]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Discovery Report]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order]
  • March 17, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 15, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 15, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 14, 2017: [Reply]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 02, 2017: [Stipulation]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 21, 2017: [PHV Fee Paid]
  • February 21, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 14, 2017: [Extend]
  • February 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 24, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • January 19, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 19, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 18, 2017: [Return of Service Executed]
  • January 18, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • December 23, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 23, 2016: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 23, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.